This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/26/2023 at 14:50:00 (UTC).

KAYLA GAON VS WORLD UNITY INTERNATIONAL LLC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/07/2022 KAYLA GAON filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against WORLD UNITY INTERNATIONAL LLC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BEVERLY BOURNE. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1858

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

BEVERLY BOURNE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GAON KAYLA

Defendants

WORLD UNITY INTERNATIONAL LLC.

WORLD UNITY INTERNATIONAL PROPERTY MANAGEMENT INC.

LAUREL CANYON APARTMENTS LLC.

LAUREL CANYON TERRACE APARTMENTS LLC

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration

1/10/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration

Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration - Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration

1/9/2023: Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration - Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

11/9/2022: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Notice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs - Notice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs

11/10/2022: Notice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs - Notice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs

Notice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs - Notice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs

11/10/2022: Notice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs - Notice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

11/10/2022: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 11/09/2022, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

11/9/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 11/09/2022, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

11/9/2022: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Request for Court Order and Answer]

10/25/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Request for Court Order and Answer]

Answer on Request for Court Order and Answer - Answer on Request for Court Order and Answer

10/24/2022: Answer on Request for Court Order and Answer - Answer on Request for Court Order and Answer

Request for Court Order and Answer - Request for Court Order and Answer

10/24/2022: Request for Court Order and Answer - Request for Court Order and Answer

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Request for Court Order and Answer]

10/24/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Request for Court Order and Answer]

Request for Court Order and Answer - Request for Court Order and Answer

10/19/2022: Request for Court Order and Answer - Request for Court Order and Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/7/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

9/26/2022: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

9/26/2022: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

9/26/2022: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

9/7/2022: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2023
  • Hearing03/17/2023 at 01:30 PM in Department A at 300 East Walnut St., Pasadena, CA 91101; Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment (CCP 473)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration: As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment (CCP 473) scheduled for 03/17/2023 at 01:30 PM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration; Issued by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketNotice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration; Filed by: World Unity International LLC. (Defendant); World Unity International Property Management, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims): As To Parties changed from World Unity International LLC. (Defendant) to World Unity International LLC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketNotice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs; Filed by: Clerk; As to: World Unity International LLC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketNotice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs; Filed by: Clerk; As to: World Unity International Property Management, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Kayla Gaon on 09/07/2022, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to Laurel Canyon Apartments, LLC. and Laurel Canyon Terrace Apartments LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Kayla Gaon (Plaintiff); As to: Laurel Canyon Apartments, LLC. (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: Yes; Service Date: 09/21/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Kayla Gaon (Plaintiff); As to: World Unity International LLC. (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 09/21/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Kayla Gaon (Plaintiff); As to: World Unity International Property Management, Inc. (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: Yes; Service Date: 09/21/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Kayla Gaon (Plaintiff); As to: World Unity International LLC. (Defendant); World Unity International Property Management, Inc. (Defendant); Laurel Canyon Apartments, LLC. (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Kayla Gaon (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Kayla Gaon (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Beverly Bourne in Department A Pasadena Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/09/2022 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less