This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/17/2022 at 05:51:53 (UTC).

KAREN FRANCO, ET AL. VS ELVIRA VIANEY VAZQUEZ, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/22/2021 KAREN FRANCO filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ELVIRA VIANEY VAZQUEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KATHERINE CHILTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6904

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KATHERINE CHILTON

 

Party Details

Cross Defendants, Not Classified By Court and Plaintiffs

FRANCO KAREN

FRANCO MARISELA

FRANCO EUSEBIO

VAZQUEZ ELVIRA VIANEY

RANGEL SALVADOR

Cross Plaintiffs, Not Classified By Court and Defendants

VAZQUEZ ELVIRA VIANEY

RANGEL SALVADOR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JORGENSEN RICHARD ALLEN

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant Attorney

ARAKELYAN CRISTINA

 

Court Documents

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

9/22/2021: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

9/22/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

9/22/2021: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

Summons - Summons on Complaint

9/22/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/22/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/22/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

9/22/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

9/22/2021: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Summons - Summons Cross Summons

10/26/2021: Summons - Summons Cross Summons

Answer - Answer

10/26/2021: Answer - Answer

Cross-Complaint - Cross-Complaint

10/26/2021: Cross-Complaint - Cross-Complaint

Answer - Answer

12/2/2021: Answer - Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2024
  • Hearing09/25/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • Hearing03/22/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Karen Franco (Cross-Defendant); As to: Elvira Vianey Vazquez (Cross-Complainant); Salvador Rangel (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Answer Cross: Name Extension: Cross; As To Parties changed from Salvador Rangel (Cross-Complainant), Elvira Vianey Vazquez (Cross-Complainant) to Salvador Rangel (Cross-Complainant), Elvira Vianey Vazquez (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Answer (Cross): Name Extension changed from Cross to (Cross); As To Parties changed from Elvira Vianey Vazquez (Cross-Complainant), Salvador Rangel (Cross-Complainant) to Salvador Rangel (Cross-Complainant), Elvira Vianey Vazquez (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Elvira Vianey Vazquez (Defendant); Salvador Rangel (Defendant); As to: Karen Franco (Plaintiff); Marisela Franco (Plaintiff); Eusebio Franco (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by: Elvira Vianey Vazquez (Defendant); Salvador Rangel (Defendant); As to: Karen Franco (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketSummons Cross Summons; Issued and Filed by: Elvira Vianey Vazquez (Defendant); Salvador Rangel (Defendant); As to: Karen Franco (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/25/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Katherine Chilton in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/22/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Karen Franco (Plaintiff); Marisela Franco (Plaintiff); Eusebio Franco (Plaintiff); As to: Elvira Vianey Vazquez (Defendant); Salvador Rangel (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Karen Franco (Plaintiff); Marisela Franco (Plaintiff); Eusebio Franco (Plaintiff); As to: Elvira Vianey Vazquez (Defendant); Salvador Rangel (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Karen Franco (Plaintiff); Marisela Franco (Plaintiff); Eusebio Franco (Plaintiff); As to: Elvira Vianey Vazquez (Defendant); Salvador Rangel (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Karen Franco (Plaintiff); Marisela Franco (Plaintiff); Eusebio Franco (Plaintiff); As to: Elvira Vianey Vazquez (Defendant); Salvador Rangel (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ARAKELYAN CRISTINA