This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/28/2022 at 00:41:27 (UTC).

KANG SOO YOO VS LADWP

Case Summary

On 11/23/2021 KANG SOO YOO filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against LADWP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is VICTOR M. ACEVEDO. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0897

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

VICTOR M. ACEVEDO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

YOO KANG SOO

Defendant

LADWP

 

Court Documents

Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

11/23/2021: Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

11/23/2021: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

11/23/2021: Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/7/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/07/2022

1/7/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/07/2022

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

1/7/2022: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)]

1/26/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)]

Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

1/25/2022: Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

1/24/2022: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims), Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)]

3/29/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims), Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)]

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

3/24/2022: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

3/23/2022: Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

3/23/2022: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 03/23/2022

3/23/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 03/23/2022

Notice of Rejection - Notice of Rejection

3/16/2022: Notice of Rejection - Notice of Rejection

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection]

3/16/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection]

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

4/21/2022: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Kang Soo Yoo (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Kang Soo Yoo on 11/23/2021, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Kang Soo Yoo as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/28/2022 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department 7 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/21/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims), Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)]; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketPursuant to the request of defendant, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/05/2022 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department 7 Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion was rescheduled to 04/28/2022 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketRequest to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: LADWP (Defendant); Has the Claim Been Served?: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketOrder on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: As to: LADWP (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 03/23/2022; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketNotice of Rejection; Issued by: Clerk; As to: LADWP (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/07/2022 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department 7 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 01/28/2022 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/28/2022 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department 7

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/07/2022; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Kang Soo Yoo (Plaintiff); As to: LADWP (Defendant); Service Cost: 39.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Kang Soo Yoo (Plaintiff); As to: LADWP (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Victor M. Acevedo in Department 7 Compton Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/07/2022 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department 7

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LADWP is a litigant