This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/16/2021 at 19:11:36 (UTC).

KAITLYN WUENSCH VS GYMPROS, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/11/2021 KAITLYN WUENSCH filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GYMPROS, INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KATHERINE CHILTON. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4441

  • Filing Date:

    06/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KATHERINE CHILTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WUENSCH KAITLYN

Defendants

GYMPROS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

CROCKER ROY F

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ZEE TAPPAN ESQ.

BARRIENTOS KIMBERLY SUE NAVARRO ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

6/11/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

6/11/2021: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Complaint - Complaint

6/11/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/11/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

6/11/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/1/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

8/27/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

8/27/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Default Judgment - Default Judgment

10/13/2021: Default Judgment - Default Judgment

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration of Plaintiff's Attorney, Tappan Zee, esq

9/22/2021: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration of Plaintiff's Attorney, Tappan Zee, esq

Statement of the Case - Statement of the Case

9/22/2021: Statement of the Case - Statement of the Case

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

9/22/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketDefault judgment by Court entered for Plaintiff Kaitlyn Wuensch against Defendant Gympros, Inc. a California corporation and Defendant Roy F Crocker on the Complaint filed by Kaitlyn Wuensch on 06/11/2021 for damages of $6,350.00, attorney fees of $471.00, interest of $744.60, and costs of $672.90 for a total of $8,238.50.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Signed and Filed by: Kaitlyn Wuensch (Plaintiff); As to: Gympros, Inc. a California corporation (Defendant); Roy F Crocker (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Default Judgment: As To Parties changed from Roy F Crocker (Defendant), Gympros, Inc. a California corporation (Defendant) to Gympros, Inc. a California corporation (Defendant), Roy F Crocker (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/09/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/13/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/14/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/13/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Kaitlyn Wuensch (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketDeclaration Declaration of Plaintiff's Attorney, Tappan Zee, esq; Filed by: Kaitlyn Wuensch (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketStatement of the Case; Filed by: Kaitlyn Wuensch (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Kaitlyn Wuensch on 06/11/2021, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Kaitlyn Wuensch, does 1-10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Kaitlyn Wuensch (Plaintiff); As to: Gympros, Inc. a California corporation (Defendant); Roy F Crocker (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Kaitlyn Wuensch (Plaintiff); As to: Roy F Crocker (Defendant); Service Date: 07/07/2021; Service Cost: 377.66; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Kaitlyn Wuensch (Plaintiff); As to: Gympros, Inc. a California corporation (Defendant); Service Date: 06/21/2021; Service Cost: 67.99; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/09/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/14/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Kaitlyn Wuensch (Plaintiff); As to: Gympros, Inc. a California corporation (Defendant); Roy F Crocker (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Kaitlyn Wuensch (Plaintiff); As to: Gympros, Inc. a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Kaitlyn Wuensch (Plaintiff); As to: Gympros, Inc. a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Katherine Chilton in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GYMPROS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZEE LAW GROUP, P.C. - TAPPAN ZEE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BARRIENTOS KIMBERLY SUE NAVARRO