This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/27/2022 at 01:42:25 (UTC).

JUSTIJ FARAHI VS AMAZON CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 12/20/2021 JUSTIJ FARAHI filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against AMAZON CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2049

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FARAHI JUSTIJ

Defendant

AMAZON CORPORATION

 

Court Documents

Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

12/20/2021: Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

12/20/2021: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

12/20/2021: Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/24/2022

2/24/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/24/2022

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

2/24/2022: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/24/2022; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/24/2022 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department S Not Held - Vacated by Court on 02/24/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Justij Farahi on 12/20/2021, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: As To Parties changed from Amazon Corporation (Defendant) to Amazon Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: As To Parties changed from Amazon Corporation (Defendant) to Amazon Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/24/2022 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Justij Farahi (Plaintiff); As to: Amazon Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Lisa K Sepe-Wiesenfeld in Department S Santa Monica Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMAZON INC is a litigant