This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/03/2022 at 02:25:46 (UTC).

JUNEFFER GAMBIN VS ORBITZ,LLC

Case Summary

On 04/22/2022 JUNEFFER GAMBIN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ORBITZ,LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID K. REINERT. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0570

  • Filing Date:

    04/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

DAVID K. REINERT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GAMBIN JUNEFFER

Defendant

ORBITZ LLC

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court]

4/26/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court]

Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

4/22/2022: Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

4/22/2022: Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

4/22/2022: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice of Postponement - Notice of Postponement

5/6/2022: Notice of Postponement - Notice of Postponement

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

5/5/2022: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

5/5/2022: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 06/30/2022

6/30/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 06/30/2022

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

6/30/2022: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Juneffer Gambin on 04/22/2022, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 06/30/2022; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/30/2022 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 1 updated: Result Date to 06/30/2022; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketPursuant to the request of plaintiff, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/16/2022 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 1 Not Held - Rescheduled by Party was rescheduled to 06/30/2022 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketNotice of Postponement; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk; As to: Orbitz,LLC (Defendant); Service Cost: 25.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 05/04/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketRequest to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Juneffer Gambin (Plaintiff); Has the Claim Been Served?: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/16/2022 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Juneffer Gambin (Plaintiff); As to: Orbitz,LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. David K. Reinert in Department 1 Inglewood Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ORBITZ is a litigant