This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/06/2021 at 08:42:32 (UTC).

JULIA KANG VS DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, LA

Case Summary

On 08/24/2021 JULIA KANG filed an Infraction - Parking lawsuit against DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, LA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KATHERINE CHILTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6178

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Infraction - Parking

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KATHERINE CHILTON

 

Party Details

Appellant

KANG JULIA

Respondent

DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION LA

 

Court Documents

Request for Administrative File - Request for Administrative File

9/1/2021: Request for Administrative File - Request for Administrative File

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

8/24/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

8/24/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Notice of Appeal - Parking - Notice of Appeal - Parking

8/24/2021: Notice of Appeal - Parking - Notice of Appeal - Parking

Notice of Decision - Final Administrative Decision - Notice of Decision - Final Administrative Decision

8/24/2021: Notice of Decision - Final Administrative Decision - Notice of Decision - Final Administrative Decision

Notice of Appeal - Notice of Appeal Hearing on Parking Appeal

9/1/2021: Notice of Appeal - Notice of Appeal Hearing on Parking Appeal

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2021
  • Hearing11/05/2021 at 09:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Parking Appeal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketHearing on Parking Appeal scheduled for 11/05/2021 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Appeal Hearing on Parking Appeal; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketRequest for Administrative File; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Appeal - Parking - Citation Number: 4528015063; Filed by: Julia Kang (Appellant); As to: Department of Transportation, LA (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Julia Kang (Appellant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Julia Kang (Appellant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Decision - Final Administrative Decision; Filed by: Julia Kang (Appellant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Katherine Chilton in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION is a litigant