This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/13/2023 at 04:45:14 (UTC).

JUANITA CASTANON-GAMBOA VS ADT SECURITY CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/02/2022 JUANITA CASTANON-GAMBOA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ADT SECURITY CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK E. WINDHAM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0682

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MARK E. WINDHAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CASTANON-GAMBOA JUANITA JUNITAS FLOWERS AND BOTANICS

Defendants

ADT SECURITY CORPORATION

AMERICA'S SECURITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

LEWIS STEPHEN

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Reclassify (Walker Motion))

1/10/2023: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Reclassify (Walker Motion))

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to Reclassify (Walker Motion)) of 01/10/2023

1/10/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to Reclassify (Walker Motion)) of 01/10/2023

Notice of Motion - Notice of Motion

12/13/2022: Notice of Motion - Notice of Motion

Notice (name extension) - Notice ADT LLC's Notice to Adverse Party of Removal of Case to Federal Court

11/4/2022: Notice (name extension) - Notice ADT LLC's Notice to Adverse Party of Removal of Case to Federal Court

Notice of Removal to Federal Court - Notice of Removal to Federal Court

11/4/2022: Notice of Removal to Federal Court - Notice of Removal to Federal Court

Notice (name extension) - Notice ADT LLCS Notice To Adverse Party Of Removal Of Case To Federal Court

11/2/2022: Notice (name extension) - Notice ADT LLCS Notice To Adverse Party Of Removal Of Case To Federal Court

Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

9/29/2022: Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

Notice (name extension) - Notice Change of Address form MC-040

8/18/2022: Notice (name extension) - Notice Change of Address form MC-040

Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

8/9/2022: Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Reclassify (Walker Motion))

7/19/2022: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Reclassify (Walker Motion))

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to Reclassify (Walker Motion)) of 07/19/2022

7/19/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to Reclassify (Walker Motion)) of 07/19/2022

Motion to Reclassify - Motion to Reclassify

3/21/2022: Motion to Reclassify - Motion to Reclassify

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

3/21/2022: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Related Case - Notice of Related Case

3/30/2022: Notice of Related Case - Notice of Related Case

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

2/7/2022: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

2/7/2022: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/2/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

2/2/2022: Complaint - Complaint

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2025
  • Hearing02/05/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2023
  • Hearing08/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • Hearing02/28/2023 at 09:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: (name extension)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Motion to Reclassify: Filed By: Juanita Castanon-Gamboa (Plaintiff); Result: Off Calendar ; Result Date: 01/10/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Status of Removed Case scheduled for 02/28/2023 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion to Reclassify (Walker Motion))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to Reclassify (Walker Motion)) of 01/10/2023; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Reclassify (Walker Motion) scheduled for 01/10/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on 01/10/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketNotice of Motion; Filed by: Juanita Castanon-Gamboa (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketNotice of Removal to Federal Court; Filed by: ADT Security Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Juanita Castanon-Gamboa (Plaintiff); As to: ADT Security Corporation (Defendant); America's Security (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/05/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Juanita Castanon-Gamboa (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Mark E. Windham in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Adt Security Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICA'S SECURITY A CA. CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEWIS STEPHEN