This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/15/2021 at 22:16:18 (UTC).

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. VS XINIA ALFARO

Case Summary

On 07/26/2021 JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against XINIA ALFARO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RANDY RHODES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6851

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RANDY RHODES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK N.A.

Defendant

ALFARO XINIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SEBOURN THOMAS J

Defendant Attorney

BRISSON PAUL

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

7/26/2021: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

7/26/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/26/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

7/26/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

7/26/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

8/2/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Trial - Notice of Trial

8/27/2021: Notice of Trial - Notice of Trial

Answer - Answer

8/27/2021: Answer - Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2022
  • Hearing08/01/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department F43 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: XINIA ALFARO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Trial; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Event scheduled for 08/01/2022 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Type changed from Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 to Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: XINIA ALFARO (Defendant); Service Date: 07/31/2021; Service Cost: 69.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 08/01/2022 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Randy Rhodes in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: XINIA ALFARO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: XINIA ALFARO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: XINIA ALFARO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JPMorgan Chase Bank NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRISSON PAUL