This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/03/2023 at 15:24:52 (UTC).

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. VS LESLY CORNEJO

Case Summary

On 11/28/2022 JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against LESLY CORNEJO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is NICHOLAS F. DAUM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6497

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

NICHOLAS F. DAUM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK N.A.

Defendant

CORNEJO LESLY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEE SUNNY

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11/28/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Summons - Summons on Complaint

11/28/2022: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/28/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

11/28/2022: Complaint - Complaint

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

11/28/2022: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

12/12/2022: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2023
  • Hearing12/04/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department F43 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: LESLY CORNEJO (Defendant); Service Date: 12/11/2022; Service Cost: 71.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 12/04/2023 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Nicholas F. Daum in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: LESLY CORNEJO (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: LESLY CORNEJO (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: LESLY CORNEJO (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JPMorgan Chase Bank NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEE SUNNY