This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/16/2021 at 14:24:59 (UTC).

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. VS JASON L CENTANNI

Case Summary

On 07/29/2021 JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JASON L CENTANNI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARIA ANDREA DAVALOS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8097

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MARIA ANDREA DAVALOS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK N.A.

Defendant

CENTANNI JASON L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SEBOURN THOMAS J

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/17/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

7/29/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Complaint - Complaint

7/29/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/29/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

7/29/2021: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Summons - Summons on Complaint

7/29/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/04/2022
  • Hearing08/04/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: JASON L CENTANNI (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 08/16/2021; Service Cost: 69.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: JASON L CENTANNI (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: JASON L CENTANNI (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: JASON L CENTANNI (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 08/04/2022 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Maria Andrea Davalos in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JPMorgan Chase Bank NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sebourn, Thomas J.