This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/01/2021 at 08:30:54 (UTC).

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. VS CARTER J KENDALL

Case Summary

On 10/07/2021 JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CARTER J KENDALL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SCOTT R. HERIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7452

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SCOTT R. HERIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK N.A.

Defendant

KENDALL CARTER J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PHAN-HUY DON

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

10/7/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Complaint - Complaint

10/7/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

10/7/2021: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/7/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

10/7/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2022
  • Hearing10/13/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 10/13/2022 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Scott R. Herin in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Carter J Kendall (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Carter J Kendall (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Carter J Kendall (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JPMorgan Chase Bank NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PHAN-HUY DON