This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/18/2022 at 15:44:26 (UTC).

JOSIE MACADANGDANG, ET AL. VS FRANCHISE TAX BOARD

Case Summary

On 08/20/2021 JOSIE MACADANGDANG filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against FRANCHISE TAX BOARD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARCELO D'ASERO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0499

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MARCELO D'ASERO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MACADANGDANG JOSIE

CLIFTON GEORGE

Defendant

FRANCHISE TAX BOARD

 

Court Documents

Response (name extension) - Response to Court's Order on Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment

4/7/2022: Response (name extension) - Response to Court's Order on Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review)]

4/7/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review)]

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review)

4/7/2022: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of 04/07/2022

4/7/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of 04/07/2022

Order on Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment - Order on Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment

3/7/2022: Order on Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment - Order on Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment

Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment and Answer - Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment and Answer

2/16/2022: Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment and Answer - Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment and Answer

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment and Answer]

2/16/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment and Answer]

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/23/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/23/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

12/28/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

12/29/2021: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

1/10/2022: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Order (name extension) - Order Ruling on Submitted Matter and Judgment

1/10/2022: Order (name extension) - Order Ruling on Submitted Matter and Judgment

Minute Order - Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

1/10/2022: Minute Order - Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 01/10/2022

1/10/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 01/10/2022

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/26/2021

10/26/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/26/2021

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

10/26/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketResponse to Court's Order on Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment; Filed by: George Clifton (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review)]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of 04/07/2022; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketOrder on Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment; Filed by: Clerk; As to: Josie Macadangdang (Plaintiff); George Clifton (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment and Answer: As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment and Answer: As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment and Answer: As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketRequest to Correct or Cancel Judgment and Answer; Filed by: Josie Macadangdang (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment and Answer: As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketPursuant to the request of plaintiff, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/26/2021 at 01:30 PM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A22 Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion was rescheduled to 12/28/2021 01:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Small Claims Trial / Hearings; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice of Small Claims Trial / Hearings]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/26/2021 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A22 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 10/26/2021 01:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: As To Parties changed from Franchise Tax Board (Defendant) to Franchise Tax Board (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/26/2021 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Josie Macadangdang (Plaintiff); George Clifton (Plaintiff); As to: Franchise Tax Board (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Marcelo D'Asero in Department A22 Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FRANCHISE TAX BOARD is a litigant