This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/19/2022 at 09:12:45 (UTC).

JOSIE KOTH VS ERICK PELLECER PELAYO, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/14/2022 JOSIE KOTH filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ERICK PELLECER PELAYO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD F. WALMARK. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0092

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RICHARD F. WALMARK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KOTH JOSIE

Defendants

PELAYO ERICK PELLECER

ENTERPRISE RENT-A-CAR COMPANY OF LOS ANGELES LLC DBA ENTERPRISE RENT A CAR #3219

 

Court Documents

Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

1/14/2022: Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

1/14/2022: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

1/14/2022: Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/1/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

2/3/2022: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 03/04/2022

3/4/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 03/04/2022

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

3/4/2022: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

3/4/2022: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 03/04/2022; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketAddress for Josie Koth (Plaintiff) clerical correction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/04/2022 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P updated: Result Date to 03/04/2022; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Josie Koth on 01/14/2022, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company of Los Angeles, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Josie Koth against Defendant Erick Pellecer Pelayo on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Josie Koth on 01/14/2022 for the principal amount of $6,900.00 and costs of $155.00 for a total of $7,055.00.; This judgment results from a motor vehicle accident on a California highway and was caused by the judgment debtor's operation of a motor vehicle. If the judgment is not paid, the judgment creditor may apply to have the judgment debtor's drivers license suspended.; Other: Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company is dismissed Judgment Debtor's Statement of Assets is mailed to judgment debtor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Josie Koth (Plaintiff); As to: Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company of Los Angeles, LLC (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 02/01/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Josie Koth (Plaintiff); As to: Erick Pellecer Pelayo (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 01/31/2022; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Josie Koth (Plaintiff); As to: Erick Pellecer Pelayo (Defendant); Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company of Los Angeles, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Richard F. Walmark in Department P Van Nuys Courthouse East

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/04/2022 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ENTERPRISE RENT-A-CAR COMPANY OF LOS is a litigant