This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/24/2022 at 03:06:18 (UTC).

JOSEPH LLOYD BUCKLEY JR., ET AL. VS PLB MANAGEMENT, LLC

Case Summary

On 09/22/2021 JOSEPH LLOYD BUCKLEY JR filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PLB MANAGEMENT, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS J. GRIEGO. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3506

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

THOMAS J. GRIEGO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BUCKLEY JR. JOSEPH LLOYD

BUCKLEY MELISSA LYNN

Defendant

PLB MANAGEMENT LLC DBA PARK LA BREA MANAGEMENT

 

Court Documents

Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

9/22/2021: Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

9/22/2021: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims

9/22/2021: Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

9/23/2021: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

11/16/2021: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

11/16/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 11/16/2021

11/16/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 11/16/2021

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of 01/18/2022

1/18/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of 01/18/2022

Minute Order - Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

1/18/2022: Minute Order - Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

1/18/2022: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

1/18/2022: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/18/2022

1/18/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/18/2022

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

1/18/2022: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

1/18/2022: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Joseph Lloyd Buckley Jr. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Joseph Lloyd Buckley Jr. and Plaintiff Melissa Lynn Buckley against Defendant PLB Management, LLC DBA Park La Brea Management on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Joseph Lloyd Buckley Jr., et al. on 09/22/2021 for the principal amount of $7,315.00 and costs of $115.00 for a total of $7,430.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Joseph Lloyd Buckley Jr., et al. on 09/22/2021 as follows: Defendant PLB Management, LLC DBA Park La Brea Management does not owe the plaintiffs Joseph Lloyd Buckley Jr. Melissa Lynn Buckley any money on plaintiff's claim. Other: Plaintiffs have paid fair market value for their apartment unit at a cost of $2675/month for rental period, Feb. 2020 through February 2022. Plaintiff's do not owe the Defendant $7315.00 in unpaid rent claimed by the Defendant ($675.00 per month) as the Defendant failed to timely allow the Plaintiff to modify his February 2021 year lease for 4 months by Defendant's failure to respond to Plaintiff's' multiple requests for Lease Modification consideration from August 2020 through December 2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/18/2022; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/18/2022 at 10:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90 updated: Result Date to 01/18/2022; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of 01/18/2022; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Joseph Lloyd Buckley Jr., et al. on 09/22/2021, judgment entered on 01/18/2022 is vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/16/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 01/18/2022 10:00 AM at Department 90

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/18/2022 at 10:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: PLB Management, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Joseph Lloyd Buckley Jr. (Plaintiff); Melissa Lynn Buckley (Plaintiff); As to: PLB Management, LLC (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 09/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Joseph Lloyd Buckley Jr. (Plaintiff); Melissa Lynn Buckley (Plaintiff); As to: PLB Management, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Thomas J. Griego in Department 1A Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/16/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PLB MANAGEMENT A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY CORPORATION is a litigant