This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/06/2022 at 09:52:33 (UTC).

JOSEFINA VEGA VS MINERVA SANCHEZ

Case Summary

On 07/20/2021 JOSEFINA VEGA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MINERVA SANCHEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KATHERINE CHILTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5320

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KATHERINE CHILTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VEGA JOSEFINA

Defendant

SANCHEZ MINERVA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CHOO SAMUEL ESQ.

CHOO SAMUEL L.

Defendant Attorney

MANESH VICTORIA

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

7/20/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

7/20/2021: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

7/20/2021: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/20/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

7/20/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

7/20/2021: Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

Summons - Summons on Complaint

7/20/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

7/20/2021: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Amended Complaint - Amended Complaint (1st)

7/22/2021: Amended Complaint - Amended Complaint (1st)

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

8/30/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Answer - Answer

10/4/2021: Answer - Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2024
  • Hearing07/23/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • Hearing01/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Minerva Sanchez (Defendant); As to: Josefina Vega (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Josefina Vega (Plaintiff); As to: Minerva Sanchez (Defendant); Service Date: 08/24/2021; Service Cost: 110.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketAmended Complaint (1st); Filed by: Josefina Vega (Plaintiff); As to: Josefina Vega (Plaintiff); Minerva Sanchez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Samuel L. Choo (Attorney): Organization Name changed from Law Offices of John C. Ye, APLC to Law Office of John Ye; Name Suffix: blank; Middle Name: L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Josefina Vega (Plaintiff); As to: Minerva Sanchez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 07/23/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Katherine Chilton in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Josefina Vega (Plaintiff); As to: Minerva Sanchez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Josefina Vega (Plaintiff); As to: Minerva Sanchez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Josefina Vega (Plaintiff); As to: Minerva Sanchez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MANESH VICTORIA