This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/29/2022 at 12:18:58 (UTC).

JOSE RIOS HERRERA VS ROBERT LAUDISI

Case Summary

On 05/16/2022 JOSE RIOS HERRERA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ROBERT LAUDISI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KATHERINE CHILTON. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3335

  • Filing Date:

    05/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KATHERINE CHILTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HERRERA JOSE RIOS

Defendant

LAUDISI ROBERT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GLADKOV SERGEI N. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/16/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

5/16/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

5/16/2022: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

5/16/2022: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Summons - Summons on Complaint

5/16/2022: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

5/16/2022: Complaint - Complaint

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

5/16/2022: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

10/3/2022: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Jose Rios Herrera on 05/16/2022, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Jose Rios Herrera as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/04/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/19/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/04/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Jose Rios Herrera (Plaintiff); As to: Robert Laudisi (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Jose Rios Herrera (Plaintiff); As to: Robert Laudisi (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Katherine Chilton in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Jose Rios Herrera (Plaintiff); As to: Robert Laudisi (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Jose Rios Herrera (Plaintiff); As to: Robert Laudisi (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/19/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GLADKOV SERGEI N. ESQ