This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/12/2021 at 12:37:28 (UTC).

JOSE ESTRADA VS KODIMER INVESTMENTS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/12/2021 JOSE ESTRADA filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against KODIMER INVESTMENTS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0285

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ESTRADA JOSE

Defendants

HAFSA CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

KODIMER INVESTMENTS LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HANDY RUSSELL CLIVE

Defendant Attorney

AHMAD MOHAMAD

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

1/12/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

1/12/2021: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/12/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

1/12/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

1/12/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/26/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

2/2/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

2/23/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

2/22/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Answer - Answer

3/11/2021: Answer - Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/16/2024
  • Hearing01/16/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • Hearing07/12/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Hafsa Corporation, a California Corporation (Defendant); As to: Jose Estrada (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint): As To Parties: Kodimer Investments, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Jose Estrada (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketAddress for Russell Clive Handy (Attorney) null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Jose Estrada on 01/12/2021, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Jose Estrada as to Kodimer Investments, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Jose Estrada (Plaintiff); As to: Kodimer Investments, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant); Service Date: 01/21/2021; Service Cost: 35.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Jose Estrada (Plaintiff); As to: Hafsa Corporation, a California Corporation (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 01/21/2021; Service Cost: 35.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Jose Estrada (Plaintiff); As to: Kodimer Investments, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant); Hafsa Corporation, a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Jose Estrada (Plaintiff); As to: Kodimer Investments, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant); Hafsa Corporation, a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Jose Estrada (Plaintiff); As to: Kodimer Investments, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant); Hafsa Corporation, a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/12/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 01/16/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KODIMER INVESTMENTS LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where HAFSA CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant