This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/23/2021 at 17:38:26 (UTC).

JOSE CASILLAS VS HUMBLE FASHION LLC, A NEW YORK LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 06/11/2021 JOSE CASILLAS filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against HUMBLE FASHION LLC, A NEW YORK LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KATHERINE CHILTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4419

  • Filing Date:

    06/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KATHERINE CHILTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CASILLAS JOSE

Defendants

HUMBLE FASHION LLC A NEW YORK LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

HUMBLE FASHION LLC A MINNESOTA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ABIRI ROBERT

 

Court Documents

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) - Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

9/1/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) - Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Complaint - Complaint

6/11/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/11/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

6/11/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

6/11/2021: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

6/11/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2024
  • Hearing06/14/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • Hearing12/09/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Humble Fashion LLC, a Minnesota Limited Liability Company (Defendant): Organization Name changed from Humble Fashion LLC, a New York Limited Liability Company to Humble Fashion LLC, a Minnesota Limited Liability Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name): Filed By: Jose Casillas (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 09/01/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Jose Casillas (Plaintiff); As to: Humble Fashion LLC, a New York Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Jose Casillas (Plaintiff); As to: Humble Fashion LLC, a New York Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Jose Casillas (Plaintiff); As to: Humble Fashion LLC, a New York Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/09/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/14/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Katherine Chilton in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ABIRI ROBERT