This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/15/2023 at 03:00:52 (UTC).

JOSE CASILLAS VS CITIZENS OF HUMANITY, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 08/17/2021 JOSE CASILLAS filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against CITIZENS OF HUMANITY, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is UPINDER S. KALRA. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6045

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

UPINDER S. KALRA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CASILLAS JOSE

Defendant

CITIZENS OF HUMANITY LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ABIRI ROBERT

Defendant Attorney

R TROTTER JULIE

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

8/17/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

8/17/2021: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

8/17/2021: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Complaint - Complaint

8/17/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/17/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

8/17/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

8/17/2021: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

Answer - Answer

10/7/2021: Answer - Answer

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

8/22/2022: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Jose Casillas on 08/17/2021, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Jose Casillas as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Jose Casillas (Plaintiff); As to: CITIZENS OF HUMANITY, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Robert Abiri (Attorney): Organization Name changed from Custodio & Dubey LLP to Custodio & Dubey LLP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/22/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 08/20/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/22/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: CITIZENS OF HUMANITY, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant); As to: Jose Casillas (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Jose Casillas (Plaintiff); As to: CITIZENS OF HUMANITY, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Upinder S. Kalra in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Jose Casillas (Plaintiff); As to: CITIZENS OF HUMANITY, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Jose Casillas (Plaintiff); As to: CITIZENS OF HUMANITY, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 08/20/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Citizens of Humanity, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer R TROTTER JULIE