Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/15/2021 at 10:35:41 (UTC).

JOSE CASILLAS VS ARMSTRONG GARDEN CENTERS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 03/25/2021 JOSE CASILLAS filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against ARMSTRONG GARDEN CENTERS, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2443

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CASILLAS JOSE

Defendant

ARMSTRONG GARDEN CENTERS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ABIRI ROBERT

DUBEY VINEET

CUSTODIO MIGUEL ANGEL

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

6/29/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Complaint - Complaint

3/25/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

3/25/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

3/25/2021: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/26/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

3/26/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/22/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/28/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by JOSE CASILLAS on 03/25/2021, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by JOSE CASILLAS as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/22/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/28/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: JOSE CASILLAS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: JOSE CASILLAS (Plaintiff); As to: ARMSTRONG GARDEN CENTERS, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: JOSE CASILLAS (Plaintiff); As to: ARMSTRONG GARDEN CENTERS, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ARMSTRONG GARDEN CENTERS INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DUBEY VINEET

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ABIRI ROBERT

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CUSTODIO MIGUEL A.