This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/05/2022 at 00:03:00 (UTC).

JORGE D. CARRANZA VS THE ORLEANS HOTEL & CASINO

Case Summary

On 01/04/2021 JORGE D CARRANZA filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against THE ORLEANS HOTEL CASINO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0047

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CARRANZA JORGE D.

Defendant

THE ORLEANS HOTEL & CASINO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHAHBAZ JACOB A

Defendant Attorney

MCDOWELL DAVID F.

 

Court Documents

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

1/5/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

1/4/2021: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/4/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

1/4/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

1/4/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

1/4/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

1/14/2021: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

Answer - Answer

3/2/2021: Answer - Answer

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

10/22/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketAddress for Jacob A Shahbaz (Attorney) null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/05/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 11/01/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 01/08/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 11/01/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Jorge D. Carranza on 01/04/2021, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Jorge D. Carranza as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: The Orleans Hotel & Casino (Defendant); As to: Jorge D. Carranza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Jorge D. Carranza (Plaintiff); As to: The Orleans Hotel & Casino (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Jorge D. Carranza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/05/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 01/08/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Jorge D. Carranza (Plaintiff); As to: The Orleans Hotel & Casino (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Jorge D. Carranza (Plaintiff); As to: The Orleans Hotel & Casino (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Jorge D. Carranza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Jorge D. Carranza (Plaintiff); As to: The Orleans Hotel & Casino (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCDOWELL, DAVID F