This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/28/2022 at 04:17:15 (UTC).

JONATHAN NEIL & ASSOCIATES, INC. VS STADCO, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 04/11/2022 JONATHAN NEIL ASSOCIATES, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against STADCO, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARIA ANDREA DAVALOS. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8281

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MARIA ANDREA DAVALOS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JONATHAN NEIL & ASSOCIATES INC.

Defendant

STADCO A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA STANDARD TOOL & DIE CO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MINASSIAN NATALIA

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

4/11/2022: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

4/11/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Complaint - Complaint

4/11/2022: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

4/11/2022: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/11/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

5/9/2022: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 04/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/10/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Jonathan Neil & Associates, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Stadco, a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Jonathan Neil & Associates, Inc. on 04/11/2022, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Jonathan Neil & Associates, Inc. as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 04/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Maria Andrea Davalos in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Jonathan Neil & Associates, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Stadco, a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Jonathan Neil & Associates, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Stadco, a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Jonathan Neil & Associates, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Stadco, a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STADCO A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where JONATHAN NEIL & ASSOCIATES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MINASSIAN NATALIA