This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/04/2021 at 14:49:33 (UTC).

JOHN PAUL HUTCHINS VS MOBIL 1, EXXON MOBIL

Case Summary

On 04/26/2021 JOHN PAUL HUTCHINS filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against MOBIL 1, EXXON MOBIL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KATHERINE CHILTON. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3272

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KATHERINE CHILTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HUTCHINS JOHN PAUL

Defendant

MOBIL 1 EXXON MOBIL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHAHBAZ JACOB A

Defendant Attorney

CHILLEEN MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

9/2/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Answer - Answer

5/25/2021: Answer - Answer

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

5/11/2021: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/26/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

4/26/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Complaint - Complaint

4/26/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

4/26/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

4/26/2021: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

4/27/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/24/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 09/14/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/29/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 09/14/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by John Paul Hutchins on 04/26/2021, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by John Paul Hutchins as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Mobil 1, Exxon Mobil (Defendant); As to: John Paul Hutchins (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: John Paul Hutchins (Plaintiff); As to: Mobil 1, Exxon Mobil (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Katherine Chilton in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: John Paul Hutchins (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/24/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/29/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: John Paul Hutchins (Plaintiff); As to: Mobil 1, Exxon Mobil (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: John Paul Hutchins (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: John Paul Hutchins (Plaintiff); As to: Mobil 1, Exxon Mobil (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: John Paul Hutchins (Plaintiff); As to: Mobil 1, Exxon Mobil (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHILLEEN MICHAEL