This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/24/2023 at 03:14:53 (UTC).

JOEL GELMAN VS BELTMANN GROUP,INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/30/2022 JOEL GELMAN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BELTMANN GROUP,INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID K. REINERT. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1649

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

DAVID K. REINERT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GELMAN JOEL

Defendants

BELTMANN GROUP INC.

CRST SPECIALIZED TRANSPORTATION INC.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

11/30/2022: Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

11/30/2022: Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

11/30/2022: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

12/16/2022: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

1/26/2023: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/26/2023

1/26/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/26/2023

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

1/26/2023: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

1/31/2023: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 03/21/2023, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

3/21/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 03/21/2023, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

3/21/2023: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

3/21/2023: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) Mark Maxwell

3/21/2023: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) Mark Maxwell

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2023
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) Mark Maxwell; Filed by: Beltmann Group,Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Joel Gelman against Defendant Beltmann Group,Inc. and Defendant CRST Specialized Transportation Inc. on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Joel Gelman on 11/30/2022 for the principal amount of $1,750.00 and costs of $150.00 for a total of $1,900.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 03/21/2023, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 1 updated: Result Date to 03/21/2023; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Joel Gelman (Plaintiff); As to: CRST Specialized Transportation Inc. (Defendant); Service Cost: 75.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 12/14/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/26/2023; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 1 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 03/21/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party / Other

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Joel Gelman (Plaintiff); As to: Beltmann Group,Inc. (Defendant); Service Cost: 75.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 12/13/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Joel Gelman (Plaintiff); As to: Beltmann Group,Inc. (Defendant); CRST Specialized Transportation Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. David K. Reinert in Department 1 Inglewood Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less