This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/17/2022 at 13:28:36 (UTC).

JILLA ASSADI VS FELISHA MARIE LEON

Case Summary

On 08/17/2021 JILLA ASSADI filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against FELISHA MARIE LEON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KATHERINE CHILTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6053

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KATHERINE CHILTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ASSADI JILLA

Defendant

LEON FELISHA MARIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AMELI CHANTELLE S. ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

HARN KRISTINE L.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

8/17/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

8/17/2021: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

8/17/2021: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/17/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

8/17/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

8/17/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

8/17/2021: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/14/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

10/22/2021: Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

Answer - Answer

10/22/2021: Answer - Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/22/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2024
  • Hearing08/20/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • Hearing02/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Felisha Marie Leon (Defendant); As to: Jilla Assadi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Felisha Marie Leon (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Felisha Marie Leon (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Jilla Assadi (Plaintiff); As to: Felisha Marie Leon (Defendant); Service Cost: 75.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Jilla Assadi (Plaintiff); As to: Felisha Marie Leon (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Katherine Chilton in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Jilla Assadi (Plaintiff); As to: Felisha Marie Leon (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Jilla Assadi (Plaintiff); As to: Felisha Marie Leon (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 08/20/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HARN KRISTINE L.