Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/20/2021 at 11:43:24 (UTC).

JET LINEN SERVICES LLC VS FIJI AIRWAYS LIMITED

Case Summary

On 01/21/2021 JET LINEN SERVICES LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against FIJI AIRWAYS LIMITED. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RONALD F. FRANK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0109

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RONALD F. FRANK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JET LINEN SERVICES LLC

Defendant

FIJI AIRWAYS LIMITED AKA PACIFIC LIMITED

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

1/21/2021: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court]

1/28/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court]

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/23/2021
  • Hearing04/23/2021 at 03:00 PM in Department 8 at One Regent Street, Inglewood, CA 90301; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/23/2021 at 03:00 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: JET LINEN SERVICES LLC (Plaintiff); As to: FIJI AIRWAYS LIMITED (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Ronald F. Frank in Department 8 Inglewood Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMOREPACIFIC US INC. A NEW YORK CORPORATION is a litigant