This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/10/2022 at 13:57:39 (UTC).

JESSICA NUNEZ VS MARIA SMITH

Case Summary

On 06/22/2021 JESSICA NUNEZ filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MARIA SMITH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KATHERINE CHILTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4663

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KATHERINE CHILTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NUNEZ JESSICA

Defendant

SMITH MARIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TOPCHYAN ARUTYUN

Defendant Attorney

GERMANY STANLEY

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

6/22/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/22/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

6/22/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

6/22/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

6/29/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

7/26/2021: Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

Answer - Answer

7/26/2021: Answer - Answer

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

6/22/2021: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

6/22/2021: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

6/22/2021: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

12/2/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2024
  • Hearing06/25/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • Hearing12/20/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Maria Smith (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Maria Smith (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Maria Smith (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Jessica Nunez (Plaintiff); As to: Maria Smith (Defendant); Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Katherine Chilton in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/20/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/25/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Jessica Nunez (Plaintiff); As to: Maria Smith (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Jessica Nunez (Plaintiff); As to: Maria Smith (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Jessica Nunez (Plaintiff); As to: Maria Smith (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GERMANY STANLEY