This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/20/2021 at 14:17:05 (UTC).

JEN SIM VS AROMA SPA & SPORTS, LLC

Case Summary

On 04/07/2021 JEN SIM filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against AROMA SPA SPORTS, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2742

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SIM JEN

Defendant

AROMA SPA & SPORTS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AHN PAUL S. ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

CRANERT TERRENCE L

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

4/7/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

4/7/2021: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Summons - Summons on Complaint

4/7/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/7/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

4/7/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/7/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer - Answer

5/7/2021: Answer - Answer

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

9/8/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/05/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 09/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/10/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 09/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Jen Sim on 04/07/2021, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Jen Sim as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Aroma Spa & Sports, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Aroma Spa & Sports, LLC (Defendant); As to: Jen Sim (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/05/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/10/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Jen Sim (Plaintiff); As to: Aroma Spa & Sports, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Jen Sim (Plaintiff); As to: Aroma Spa & Sports, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Jen Sim (Plaintiff); As to: Aroma Spa & Sports, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AROMA SPA AND SPORTS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CRANERT TERRENCE L