This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/20/2023 at 22:27:00 (UTC).

JASON GARWOOD VS JP MORGAN & WASHINGTON MUTUAL

Case Summary

On 10/26/2022 JASON GARWOOD filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JP MORGAN WASHINGTON MUTUAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID K. REINERT. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1496

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

DAVID K. REINERT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GARWOOD JASON

Defendant

JP MORGAN CHASE NATIONAL CORPORATE SERVICES INC.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

10/26/2022: Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

10/26/2022: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

10/26/2022: Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - (Amended)

10/27/2022: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - (Amended)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

11/14/2022: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

12/13/2022: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 12/13/2022, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

12/13/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 12/13/2022, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

12/13/2022: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

12/14/2022: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Jason Garwood against Defendant JP Morgan Chase National Corporate Services Inc. on the Amended Plaintiff's Claim (1st) filed by Jason Garwood on 10/26/2022 for the principal amount of $278.98 and costs of $70.00 for a total of $348.98.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 12/13/2022, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/13/2022 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 1 updated: Result Date to 12/13/2022; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party / Other

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Jason Garwood (Plaintiff); As to: JP Morgan Chase National Corporate Services Inc. (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 11/04/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketAmended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Jason Garwood (Plaintiff); As to: JP Morgan Chase National Corporation Services Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- JP Morgan Chase National Corporate Services Inc. (Defendant): Organization Name changed from JP Morgan Chase National Corporation Services Inc. to JP Morgan Chase National Corporate Services Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Jason Garwood (Plaintiff); As to: JP Morgan & Washington Mutual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. David K. Reinert in Department 1 Inglewood Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/13/2022 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JP MORGAN CHASE NATIONAL CORPORATE SERVICES INC. is a litigant