This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/26/2022 at 04:39:12 (UTC).

JANA SIMS VS NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/30/2022 JANA SIMS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is EMMA CASTRO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3905

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

EMMA CASTRO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SIMS JANA

Defendant

NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

9/30/2022: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

9/30/2022: Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

9/30/2022: Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) By Sheriff's Department

10/26/2022: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) By Sheriff's Department

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

11/18/2022: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection]

11/18/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection]

Notice of Rejection - Notice of Rejection

11/18/2022: Notice of Rejection - Notice of Rejection

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

11/22/2022: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Notice of Postponement - Notice of Postponement

11/22/2022: Notice of Postponement - Notice of Postponement

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2023
  • Hearing01/31/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 90 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketRequest to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company (Defendant); Has the Claim Been Served?: Yes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Postponement; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketPursuant to the request of defendant, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/02/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90 Not Held - Rescheduled by Party was rescheduled to 01/31/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection]; Issued by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketNotice of Rejection; Issued by: Clerk; As to: Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) By Sheriff's Department; Filed by: Jana Sims (Plaintiff); As to: Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 10/06/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Jana Sims (Plaintiff); As to: Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Emma Castro in Department 90 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/02/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: As To Parties changed from Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company (Defendant) to Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant