Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/17/2021 at 09:05:58 (UTC).

JAMIE BROADWAY VS ERIC PAUL TRACY

Case Summary

On 01/15/2021 JAMIE BROADWAY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ERIC PAUL TRACY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0436

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BROADWAY JAMIE

Defendant

TRACY ERIC PAUL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RASHTIAN MASON

Defendant Attorney

KIM STEVE

 

Court Documents

Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

3/1/2021: Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

Answer - Answer

3/1/2021: Answer - Answer

Summons - Summons on Complaint

1/15/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/15/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

1/15/2021: Complaint - Complaint

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

1/15/2021: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

1/15/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2024
  • Hearing01/19/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • Hearing07/15/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Eric Paul Tracy (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Eric Paul Tracy (Defendant); As to: Jamie Broadway (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 01/19/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/15/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Jamie Broadway (Plaintiff); As to: Eric Paul Tracy (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Jamie Broadway (Plaintiff); As to: Eric Paul Tracy (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Jamie Broadway (Plaintiff); As to: Eric Paul Tracy (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less