This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/17/2023 at 12:51:40 (UTC).

JAMES V. MAGGIANO VS J.P. MORGAN CHASE NATIONAL CORPORATE SERVICES, INC.

Case Summary

On 10/13/2022 JAMES filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MAGGIANO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Bellflower Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL J. PEARCE. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1238

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL J. PEARCE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MAGGIANO JAMES V.

Defendant

J.P. MORGAN CHASE NATIONAL CORPORATE SERVICES INC.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

10/13/2022: Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

10/13/2022: Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

10/13/2022: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

11/7/2022: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/7/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

11/29/2022: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

11/30/2022: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

11/30/2022: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Receipt for Exhibits - Receipt for Exhibits

11/30/2022: Receipt for Exhibits - Receipt for Exhibits

Minute Order - Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

12/12/2022: Minute Order - Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

Statement of Decision - Statement of Decision

12/12/2022: Statement of Decision - Statement of Decision

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 12/12/2022, Statement of Decision

12/12/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 12/12/2022, Statement of Decision

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

12/12/2022: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by JAMES V. MAGGLANO on 10/13/2022 as follows: Defendant J.P. MORGAN CHASE NATIONAL CORPORATE SERVICES, INC. does not owe the plaintiff JAMES V. MAGGIANO any money on plaintiff's claim. Other: Statement of Decision is attached

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketStatement of Decision; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 12/12/2022, Statement of Decision; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims): As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: J.P. MORGAN CHASE NATIONAL CORPORATE SERVICES, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketReceipt for Exhibits; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/30/2022 at 01:30 PM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 updated: Result Date to 11/30/2022; Result Type to Held - Taken under Submission

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: JAMES V. MAGGIANO (Plaintiff); As to: J.P. MORGAN CHASE NATIONAL CORPORATE SERVICES, INC. (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 10/28/2022; Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 11/04/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: As To Parties changed from J.P. MORGAN CHASE NATIONAL CORPORATE SERVICES, INC. (Defendant) to J.P. MORGAN CHASE NATIONAL CORPORATE SERVICES, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: As To Parties changed from J.P. MORGAN CHASE NATIONAL CORPORATE SERVICES, INC. (Defendant) to J.P. MORGAN CHASE NATIONAL CORPORATE SERVICES, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: JAMES V. MAGGLANO (Plaintiff); As to: J.P. MORGAN CHASE NATIONAL CORPORATE SERVICES, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael J. Pearce in Department 1 Bellflower Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/30/2022 at 01:30 PM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- JAMES V. MAGGIANO (Plaintiff): Last Name changed from MAGGLANO to MAGGIANO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • Docket** Case Name changed from JAMES V. MAGGLANO vs J.P. MORGAN CHASE NATIONAL CORPORATE SERVICES, INC. to JAMES V. MAGGIANO vs J.P. MORGAN CHASE NATIONAL CORPORATE SERVICES, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JP MORGAN CHASE NATIONAL CORPORATE SERVICES INC. is a litigant