This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/27/2022 at 23:44:40 (UTC).

JACQUELINE WATSON VS CAMACHO AUTO SALES, INC.

Case Summary

On 08/09/2021 JACQUELINE WATSON filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CAMACHO AUTO SALES, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARCELO D'ASERO. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0447

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MARCELO D'ASERO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WATSON JACQUELINE

Defendants

CAMACHO AUTO SALES INC.

CAMACHO GUSTAVO

 

Court Documents

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

8/9/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims

8/9/2021: Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims

Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

8/9/2021: Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Amended)

8/23/2021: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Amended)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

8/26/2021: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

9/28/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

9/28/2021: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/28/2021

9/28/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/28/2021

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/21/2021

10/21/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/21/2021

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

10/21/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Other - (name extension) - Other - Mutual Agreement to Settle Dispute

10/21/2021: Other - (name extension) - Other - Mutual Agreement to Settle Dispute

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

10/21/2021: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketOn the Amended Plaintiff's Claim (1st) filed by Jacqueline Watson on 08/09/2021, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Camacho Auto Sales, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketOther - Mutual Agreement to Settle Dispute; Filed by: Camacho Auto Sales, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/21/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/21/2021 at 10:00 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A22 updated: Result Date to 10/21/2021; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Camacho Auto Sales, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/21/2021 at 10:00 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/28/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketAddress for Camacho Auto Sales, Inc. (Defendant) amendment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketAmended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Jacqueline Watson (Plaintiff); As to: Camacho Auto Sales, Inc. (Defendant); Gustavo Camacho (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: As To Parties changed from Camacho Auto Sales, Inc. (Defendant), Gustavo Camacho (Defendant) to Gustavo Camacho (Defendant), Camacho Auto Sales, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Jacqueline Watson (Plaintiff); As to: Camacho Auto Sales, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Jacqueline Watson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Jacqueline Watson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Marcelo D'Asero in Department A22 Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/28/2021 at 10:00 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A22

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAMACHO AUTO SALES INC. is a litigant