This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/13/2021 at 18:08:17 (UTC).

ISL GEVA INVESTMENTS, LLC VS JAMES EDWARD D. PEREZ, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/09/2021 ISL GEVA INVESTMENTS, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JAMES EDWARD D PEREZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is UPINDER S. KALRA. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2836

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

UPINDER S. KALRA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ISL GEVA INVESTMENTS LLC

Defendants

PEREZ EDWARD JOSEPH

PEREZ JAMES EDWARD D.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZEFF MICHAEL D.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/07/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 11/05/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/12/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 11/05/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketAddress for Michael D. Zeff (Attorney) null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by ISL Geva Investments, LLC on 04/09/2021, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by ISL Geva Investments, LLC as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: ISL Geva Investments, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Edward Joseph Perez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: ISL Geva Investments, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: James Edward D. Perez (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 04/20/2021; Service Cost: 68.95; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: ISL Geva Investments, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Edward Joseph Perez (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 04/20/2021; Service Cost: 40.95; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketDefault entered as to Edward Joseph Perez; On the Complaint filed by ISL Geva Investments, LLC on 04/09/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by: Clerk; As to: James Edward D. Perez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Answer: Status Date changed from 05/21/2021 to 05/20/2021; As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Request to Waive Court Fees: Status Date changed from 05/21/2021 to 05/20/2021; Filed By: James Edward D. Perez (Defendant); Result: Granted; Result Date: 05/20/2021; As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: ISL Geva Investments, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: James Edward D. Perez (Defendant); Edward Joseph Perez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: ISL Geva Investments, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: James Edward D. Perez (Defendant); Edward Joseph Perez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: ISL Geva Investments, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: James Edward D. Perez (Defendant); Edward Joseph Perez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/07/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/12/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Upinder S. Kalra in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZEFF MICHAEL D.