This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/08/2022 at 07:37:10 (UTC).

ISL FIVE INVESTMENTS, LLC VS CRAIG JARDULA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/09/2021 ISL FIVE INVESTMENTS, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CRAIG JARDULA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2830

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ISL FIVE INVESTMENTS LLC

Defendants

JARDULA LILY E.

JARDULA CRAIG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZEFF MICHAEL D. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

4/9/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

4/9/2021: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/9/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

4/9/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

4/9/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

6/14/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/14/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/14/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

7/26/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Request (name extension) - Request PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT; SUPPORTING DECLARATIONS

7/23/2021: Request (name extension) - Request PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT; SUPPORTING DECLARATIONS

Request (name extension) - Request REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT

7/23/2021: Request (name extension) - Request REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT

Judgment - Judgment Judgment by Court

8/11/2021: Judgment - Judgment Judgment by Court

Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (Los Angeles)

9/13/2021: Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (Los Angeles)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketWrit of Execution (Los Angeles); Issued by: ISL Five Investments, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Craig Jardula (Defendant); Lily E. Jardula (Defendant); County: Los Angeles; Principal: 4290.31; Interest: 0.00; Costs: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketDefault judgment by Court entered for Plaintiff ISL Five Investments, LLC against Defendant Craig Jardula and Defendant Lily E. Jardula on the Complaint filed by ISL Five Investments, LLC on 04/09/2021 for damages of $3,646.61, attorney fees of $308.80, and costs of $334.90 for a total of $4,290.31.; Other: See court order for terms and conditions of the judgment.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketJudgment Judgment by Court; Signed and Filed by: ISL Five Investments, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Craig Jardula (Defendant); Lily E. Jardula (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment Judgment by Court: As To Parties changed from Lily E. Jardula (Defendant), Craig Jardula (Defendant) to Craig Jardula (Defendant), Lily E. Jardula (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/07/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/11/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/12/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/11/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by ISL Five Investments, LLC on 04/09/2021, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by ISL Five Investments, LLC, does 1-100 inclusive

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketRequest REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT; Filed by: ISL Five Investments, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketRequest PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT; SUPPORTING DECLARATIONS; Filed by: ISL Five Investments, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: ISL Five Investments, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Craig Jardula (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 04/27/2021; Service Cost: 68.95; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketDefault entered as to Lily E. Jardula; Craig Jardula; On the Complaint filed by ISL Five Investments, LLC on 04/09/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: ISL Five Investments, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Craig Jardula (Defendant); Lily E. Jardula (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/07/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/12/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: ISL Five Investments, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Craig Jardula (Defendant); Lily E. Jardula (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: ISL Five Investments, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Craig Jardula (Defendant); Lily E. Jardula (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: ISL Five Investments, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Craig Jardula (Defendant); Lily E. Jardula (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZEFF MICHAEL D.