This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/29/2021 at 14:41:24 (UTC).

ISIDRO MIRAMONTES VS MORGAN STANLEY & CO. LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/28/2021 ISIDRO MIRAMONTES filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against MORGAN STANLEY CO LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KATHERINE CHILTON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1332

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KATHERINE CHILTON

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MIRAMONTES ISIDRO

Respondents

MORGAN STANLEY & CO. LLC

FINANCIAL INDUSTRY REGULATORY AUTHORITY "FINRA"

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

HARRISON DAVID

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing on Petition

4/28/2021: Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing on Petition

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

4/28/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award - Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award

4/28/2021: Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award - Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award

Summons - Summons on Petition

4/28/2021: Summons - Summons on Petition

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/28/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

4/28/2021: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice (name extension) - Notice FINANCIAL INDUSTRY REGULATORY AUTHORITY INCS NON OPPOSITION TO VERIFIED PETITION TO CONFIRM DISPUTE RESOLUTION ARBITRATION AWARD

6/17/2021: Notice (name extension) - Notice FINANCIAL INDUSTRY REGULATORY AUTHORITY INCS NON OPPOSITION TO VERIFIED PETITION TO CONFIRM DISPUTE RESOLUTION ARBITRATION AWARD

Opposition (name extension) - Opposition FINANCIAL INDUSTRY REGULATORY AUTHORITY, INC.S NON-OPPOSITION TO VERIFIED PETITION TO CONFIRM DISPUTE RESOLUTION ARBITRATION AWARD

6/17/2021: Opposition (name extension) - Opposition FINANCIAL INDUSTRY REGULATORY AUTHORITY, INC.S NON-OPPOSITION TO VERIFIED PETITION TO CONFIRM DISPUTE RESOLUTION ARBITRATION AWARD

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

6/3/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

6/3/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 08/19/2021

8/19/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 08/19/2021

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

8/19/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Notice of Continuance - Notice of Continuance

9/23/2021: Notice of Continuance - Notice of Continuance

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award)

9/23/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award)

10/28/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Petition Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketHearing on Petition Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award scheduled for 10/28/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 updated: Result Date to 10/28/2021; Result Type to Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketHearing on Petition Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award scheduled for 10/28/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Continuance; Filed by: Isidro Miramontes (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Petition Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Hearing on Petition Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award scheduled for 09/23/2021 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 10/28/2021 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketHearing on Petition Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award scheduled for 09/23/2021 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 08/19/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketThere being no judge available this date, Hearing on Petition Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award scheduled for 09/01/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 09/23/2021 10:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Isidro Miramontes (Petitioner); As to: FINANCIAL INDUSTRY REGULATORY AUTHORITY ("FINRA") (Respondent); Service Date: 06/01/2021; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Isidro Miramontes (Petitioner); As to: MORGAN STANLEY & CO. LLC (Respondent); Service Date: 06/01/2021; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketPetition to Confirm Arbitration Award; Filed by: Isidro Miramontes (Petitioner); As to: MORGAN STANLEY & CO. LLC (Respondent); FINANCIAL INDUSTRY REGULATORY AUTHORITY ("FINRA") (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Isidro Miramontes (Petitioner); As to: MORGAN STANLEY & CO. LLC (Respondent); FINANCIAL INDUSTRY REGULATORY AUTHORITY ("FINRA") (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketSummons on Petition; Issued and Filed by: Isidro Miramontes (Petitioner); As to: MORGAN STANLEY & CO. LLC (Respondent); FINANCIAL INDUSTRY REGULATORY AUTHORITY ("FINRA") (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Petition; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketHearing on Petition Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award scheduled for 09/01/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Katherine Chilton in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Financial Industry Regulatory Authority, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where MORGAN STANLEY & CO LLC is a litigant