This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/27/2022 at 08:31:39 (UTC).

IRAJ FAHIMIAN VS GWEN PARKER

Case Summary

On 06/30/2021 IRAJ FAHIMIAN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GWEN PARKER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD F. WALMARK. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1301

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RICHARD F. WALMARK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FAHIMIAN IRAJ

Defendant

PARKER GWEN

 

Court Documents

Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

6/30/2021: Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

6/30/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims

6/30/2021: Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Amended)

7/12/2021: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Amended)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

7/23/2021: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

8/20/2021: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

8/19/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered on the Amended Plaintiff's Claim (1st) filed by Iraj Fahimian on 06/30/2021 as follows: Defendant Gwen Parker does not owe the plaintiff Iraj Fahimian any money on plaintiff's claim.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/19/2021 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P updated: Result Date to 08/19/2021; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Iraj Fahimian (Plaintiff); As to: Gwen Parker (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: Yes; Service Date: 07/20/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: As To Parties changed from Gwen Parker (Defendant) to Gwen Parker (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketAmended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Iraj Fahimian (Plaintiff); As to: Gwen Parker (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: As To Parties changed from Gwen Parker (Defendant) to Gwen Parker (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Iraj Fahimian (Plaintiff); As to: Gwen Parker (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Iraj Fahimian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Iraj Fahimian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Richard F. Walmark in Department P Van Nuys Courthouse East

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/19/2021 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P

    Read MoreRead Less