This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/20/2022 at 09:45:02 (UTC).

INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTOMOBILE CLUB VS SAID SAIDZADAH

Case Summary

On 12/02/2021 INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTOMOBILE CLUB filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SAID SAIDZADAH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KAREN MOSKOWITZ. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1295

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KAREN MOSKOWITZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTOMOBILE CLUB

Defendant

SAIDZADAH SAID

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHWARZ MARC A

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

12/2/2021: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

12/2/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/2/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

12/2/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

12/2/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

12/20/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2022
  • Hearing12/08/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department F43 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTOMOBILE CLUB (Plaintiff); As to: Said Saidzadah (Defendant); Service Date: 12/17/2021; Service Cost: 95.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTOMOBILE CLUB (Plaintiff); As to: Said Saidzadah (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTOMOBILE CLUB (Plaintiff); As to: Said Saidzadah (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTOMOBILE CLUB (Plaintiff); As to: Said Saidzadah (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 12/08/2022 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Karen Moskowitz in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTO CLUB is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHWARZ MARC A.