Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/10/2021 at 06:11:14 (UTC).

INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTOMOBILE CLUB VS ALFREDO A. CASTROSANCHEZ

Case Summary

On 04/08/2021 INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTOMOBILE CLUB filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against ALFREDO A CASTROSANCHEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2753

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTOMOBILE CLUB

Defendant

CASTROSANCHEZ ALFREDO A. AKA ALFREDO CASTRO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HAINES TODD F.

 

Court Documents

Summons - Summons on Complaint

4/8/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

4/8/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/8/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

4/8/2021: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

4/8/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2024
  • Hearing04/11/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • Hearing10/06/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club (Plaintiff); As to: ALFREDO A. CASTROSANCHEZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club (Plaintiff); As to: ALFREDO A. CASTROSANCHEZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club (Plaintiff); As to: ALFREDO A. CASTROSANCHEZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/06/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/11/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTO CLUB is a litigant