This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/03/2023 at 08:26:10 (UTC).

INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTOMOBILE CLUB, AN INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE VS LOUIS WILLIAM ROBINSON JR.

Case Summary

On 01/19/2022 INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTOMOBILE CLUB, AN INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LOUIS WILLIAM ROBINSON JR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KATHERINE CHILTON. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0354

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KATHERINE CHILTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTOMOBILE CLUB AN INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE

Defendant

ROBINSON JR. LOUIS WILLIAM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BAILEY JUDI

HORN STEVEN J.

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Facts re: Unsatisfied Judgment (plus Certified Judgment) - Certificate of Facts re: Unsatisfied Judgment (plus Certified Judgment)

12/27/2022: Certificate of Facts re: Unsatisfied Judgment (plus Certified Judgment) - Certificate of Facts re: Unsatisfied Judgment (plus Certified Judgment)

Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims - Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

12/27/2022: Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims - Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

Affidavit of Identity and Order - Affidavit of Identity and Order

10/31/2022: Affidavit of Identity and Order - Affidavit of Identity and Order

Association of Attorney - Association of Attorney

10/14/2022: Association of Attorney - Association of Attorney

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/1/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

7/15/2022: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death) - Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

6/15/2022: Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death) - Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

6/15/2022: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Declaration of Costs - CCP 1033 - Declaration of Costs - CCP 1033

6/15/2022: Declaration of Costs - CCP 1033 - Declaration of Costs - CCP 1033

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

6/15/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees - Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees

6/15/2022: Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees - Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

6/15/2022: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration of Cesar Baldomero, Jr.,

6/15/2022: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration of Cesar Baldomero, Jr.,

Judgment - Judgment

6/29/2022: Judgment - Judgment

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Judgment]

6/29/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Judgment]

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

5/6/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/25/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

1/19/2022: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Issued by: Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club, an interinsurance exchange (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Facts re: Unsatisfied Judgment (plus Certified Judgment); Issued by: Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club, an interinsurance exchange (Plaintiff); As to: Louis William Robinson Jr. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketAffidavit of Identity and Order; Signed and Filed by: Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club, an interinsurance exchange (Plaintiff); As to: Louis William Robinson Jr. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Affidavit of Identity and Order: Filed By: Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club, an interinsurance exchange (Plaintiff); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 10/31/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketAssociation of Attorney; Filed by: Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club, an interinsurance exchange (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club, an interinsurance exchange (Plaintiff); Louis William Robinson Jr. (Defendant); As to: Louis William Robinson Jr. (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 03/21/2022; Service Cost: 214.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club, an interinsurance exchange (Plaintiff); As to: Louis William Robinson Jr. (Defendant); After Substituted Service of Summons and Complaint ?: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketDefault judgment by Court entered for Plaintiff Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club, an interinsurance exchange against Defendant Louis William Robinson Jr. on the Complaint filed by Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club, an interinsurance exchange on 01/19/2022 for damages of $5,000.00, interest of $362.64, and costs of $547.00 for a total of $5,909.64.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketJudgment; Signed and Filed by: Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club, an interinsurance exchange (Plaintiff); As to: Louis William Robinson Jr. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment: As To Parties changed from Louis William Robinson Jr. (Defendant) to Louis William Robinson Jr. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club, an interinsurance exchange (Plaintiff); As to: Louis William Robinson Jr. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Katherine Chilton in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club, an interinsurance exchange (Plaintiff); As to: Louis William Robinson Jr. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club, an interinsurance exchange (Plaintiff); As to: Louis William Robinson Jr. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 01/22/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less