This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/23/2023 at 08:14:54 (UTC).

INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTOMOBILE CLUB, AN INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE VS ELIAZAR MERINO FLORES

Case Summary

On 03/14/2022 INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTOMOBILE CLUB, AN INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ELIAZAR MERINO FLORES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KATHERINE CHILTON. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1680

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KATHERINE CHILTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTOMOBILE CLUB AN INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE

Defendant

MERINO FLORES ELIAZAR AKA ELEAZAR MERINO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BAILEY JUDI

HORN STEVEN J.

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Facts re: Unsatisfied Judgment (plus Certified Judgment) - Certificate of Facts re: Unsatisfied Judgment (plus Certified Judgment)

10/31/2022: Certificate of Facts re: Unsatisfied Judgment (plus Certified Judgment) - Certificate of Facts re: Unsatisfied Judgment (plus Certified Judgment)

Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims - Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

10/31/2022: Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims - Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

Association of Attorney - Association of Attorney

10/28/2022: Association of Attorney - Association of Attorney

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

10/27/2022: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees - Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees

10/27/2022: Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees - Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration of Christian Trujillo

10/27/2022: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration of Christian Trujillo

Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death) - Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

10/27/2022: Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death) - Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

10/27/2022: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

10/27/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing - Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing

10/27/2022: Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing - Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

7/15/2022: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Judgment]

6/29/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Judgment]

Judgment - Judgment

6/29/2022: Judgment - Judgment

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

6/15/2022: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration of Jose Nabor Macias Lopez

6/15/2022: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration of Jose Nabor Macias Lopez

Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death) - Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

6/15/2022: Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death) - Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees - Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees

6/15/2022: Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees - Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

6/15/2022: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Issued by: Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club, an interinsurance exchange (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Facts re: Unsatisfied Judgment (plus Certified Judgment); Issued by: Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club, an interinsurance exchange (Plaintiff); As to: Eliazar Merino Flores (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketAssociation of Attorney; Filed by: Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club, an interinsurance exchange (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketDeclaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment; Filed by: Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club, an interinsurance exchange (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketStatement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death); Filed by: Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club, an interinsurance exchange (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees; Filed by: Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club, an interinsurance exchange (Plaintiff); As to: Eliazar Merino Flores (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketDeclaration Declaration of Christian Trujillo; Filed by: Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club, an interinsurance exchange (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club, an interinsurance exchange (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club, an interinsurance exchange (Plaintiff); As to: Eliazar Merino Flores (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club, an interinsurance exchange on 03/14/2022, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club, an interinsurance exchange, does 1-10

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Katherine Chilton in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/11/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/17/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club, an interinsurance exchange (Plaintiff); As to: Eliazar Merino Flores (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club, an interinsurance exchange (Plaintiff); As to: Eliazar Merino Flores (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club, an interinsurance exchange (Plaintiff); As to: Eliazar Merino Flores (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less