This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/23/2021 at 03:34:19 (UTC).

INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTOMOBILE CLUB, AN INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE VS EDITH BLANCA GAMEZ

Case Summary

On 10/07/2021 INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTOMOBILE CLUB, AN INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against EDITH BLANCA GAMEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KATHERINE CHILTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7306

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KATHERINE CHILTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTOMOBILE CLUB AN INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE

Defendant

GAMEZ EDITH BLANCA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCCLAIN DEBORAH

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

10/7/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

10/7/2021: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

10/7/2021: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/7/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

10/7/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

10/7/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

10/7/2021: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2024
  • Hearing10/10/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • Hearing04/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club, an interinsurance exchange (Plaintiff); As to: Edith Blanca Gamez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Katherine Chilton in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club, an interinsurance exchange (Plaintiff); As to: Edith Blanca Gamez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club, an interinsurance exchange (Plaintiff); As to: Edith Blanca Gamez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/10/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTO CLUB is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCCLAIN DEBORAH