This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/28/2023 at 14:09:32 (UTC).

INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTOMOBILE CLUB, AN INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE VS DAISY ANAHI GARCIA LUNA

Case Summary

On 04/14/2022 INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTOMOBILE CLUB, AN INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DAISY ANAHI GARCIA LUNA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK E. WINDHAM. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2564

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MARK E. WINDHAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTOMOBILE CLUB AN INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE

Defendant

GARCIA LUNA DAISY ANAHI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BAILEY JUDI

HORN STEVEN J.

 

Court Documents

Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims - Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

12/30/2022: Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims - Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

Certificate of Facts re: Unsatisfied Judgment (plus Certified Judgment) - Certificate of Facts re: Unsatisfied Judgment (plus Certified Judgment)

12/30/2022: Certificate of Facts re: Unsatisfied Judgment (plus Certified Judgment) - Certificate of Facts re: Unsatisfied Judgment (plus Certified Judgment)

Association of Attorney - Association of Attorney

12/28/2022: Association of Attorney - Association of Attorney

Judgment - Judgment

8/26/2022: Judgment - Judgment

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Judgment]

8/26/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Judgment]

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

9/2/2022: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

7/28/2022: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

7/28/2022: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration of Judi A. Bailey

7/28/2022: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration of Judi A. Bailey

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration of Peter Sanchez

7/28/2022: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration of Peter Sanchez

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

7/28/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death) - Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

7/28/2022: Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death) - Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

6/16/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

5/26/2022: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

4/14/2022: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Complaint - Complaint

4/14/2022: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

4/14/2022: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/14/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Issued by: Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club, an interinsurance exchange (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Facts re: Unsatisfied Judgment (plus Certified Judgment); Issued by: Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club, an interinsurance exchange (Plaintiff); As to: Daisy Anahi Garcia Luna (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketAssociation of Attorney; Filed by: Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club, an interinsurance exchange (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club, an interinsurance exchange (Plaintiff); As to: Daisy Anahi Garcia Luna (Defendant); After Substituted Service of Summons and Complaint ?: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketDefault judgment by Court entered for Plaintiff Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club, an interinsurance exchange against Defendant Daisy Anahi Garcia Luna on the Complaint filed by Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club, an interinsurance exchange on 04/14/2022 for damages of $8,044.93, interest of $350.40, and costs of $325.00 for a total of $8,720.33.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketJudgment; Signed and Filed by: Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club, an interinsurance exchange (Plaintiff); As to: Daisy Anahi Garcia Luna (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment: As To Parties changed from Daisy Anahi Garcia Luna (Defendant) to Daisy Anahi Garcia Luna (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Judgment]; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/12/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/26/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/17/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/26/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club, an interinsurance exchange (Plaintiff); As to: Daisy Anahi Garcia Luna (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Mark E. Windham in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club, an interinsurance exchange (Plaintiff); As to: Daisy Anahi Garcia Luna (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club, an interinsurance exchange (Plaintiff); As to: Daisy Anahi Garcia Luna (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/12/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/17/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less