This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/01/2022 at 17:43:05 (UTC).

INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE WEST, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS WESTERN PREMIER CONTRACTORS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 07/19/2022 INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE WEST, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed an Other lawsuit against WESTERN PREMIER CONTRACTORS, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK E. WINDHAM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4762

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MARK E. WINDHAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE WEST A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendant

WESTERN PREMIER CONTRACTORS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GASCOU CHRISTIAN JEAN

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

7/19/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

7/19/2022: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

7/19/2022: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Complaint - Complaint

7/19/2022: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

7/19/2022: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/19/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

7/19/2022: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/29/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

10/4/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2025
  • Hearing07/22/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2024
  • Hearing01/16/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Insurance Company of the West, a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Western Premier Contractors, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketDefault entered as to Western Premier Contractors, Inc., a California Corporation; On the Complaint filed by Insurance Company of the West, a California corporation on 07/19/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Insurance Company of the West, a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Western Premier Contractors, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 07/21/2022; Service Cost: 162.42; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Insurance Company of the West, a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Western Premier Contractors, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Mark E. Windham in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Insurance Company of the West, a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Western Premier Contractors, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Insurance Company of the West, a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Western Premier Contractors, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/16/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 07/22/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE WEST is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GASCOU CHRISTIAN JEAN