This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/09/2022 at 21:03:58 (UTC).

INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE WEST, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS TECHNICO TV, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 11/16/2021 INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE WEST, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against TECHNICO TV, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is UPINDER S. KALRA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8220

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

UPINDER S. KALRA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE WEST A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendant

TECHNICO TV INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GASCOU CHRISTIAN JEAN

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11/16/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

11/16/2021: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

11/16/2021: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Complaint - Complaint

11/16/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/16/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

11/16/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

11/16/2021: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2024
  • Hearing11/19/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • Hearing05/16/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Upinder S. Kalra in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/16/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/19/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Insurance Company of the West, a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Technico TV, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Insurance Company of the West, a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Technico TV, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Insurance Company of the West, a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Technico TV, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INC. TECHNICO TV is a litigant

Latest cases where INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE WEST is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GASCOU CHRISTIAN JEAN