This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/28/2021 at 20:26:34 (UTC).

INLAND VALLEY HUMANE SOCIETY ON BEHALF OF CITY OF POMONA VS PRESLY TATE TROHA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/10/2021 INLAND VALLEY HUMANE SOCIETY ON BEHALF OF CITY OF POMONA filed an Other lawsuit against PRESLY TATE TROHA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KATHERINE CHILTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1502

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KATHERINE CHILTON

 

Party Details

Petitioner

INLAND VALLEY HUMANE SOCIETY ON BEHALF OF CITY OF POMONA

Respondents

TROHA PRESLY TATE

STOCKWELL KIM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

CARVALHO SONIA RUBIO

HASSELL MICHELINA J.

GRIMES DENISE

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/11/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Animal Control Officer Tayren

5/11/2021: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Animal Control Officer Tayren

Summons - Summons on Petition

5/11/2021: Summons - Summons on Petition

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Veronica Espinoza Perez

5/11/2021: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Veronica Espinoza Perez

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Susana Espinoza Perez

5/11/2021: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Susana Espinoza Perez

Petition (name extension) - Petition For Determination of Potentially Dangerous Dog and Imposition of Fines; Memorandum of Points and Authorities

5/10/2021: Petition (name extension) - Petition For Determination of Potentially Dangerous Dog and Imposition of Fines; Memorandum of Points and Authorities

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

5/10/2021: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

5/10/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing on Petition

5/10/2021: Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing on Petition

Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing on Petition

5/12/2021: Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing on Petition

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

6/3/2021: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Petition For Determination of Potentially Dangerou...) of 06/17/2021

6/17/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Petition For Determination of Potentially Dangerou...) of 06/17/2021

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition For Determination of Potentially Dangerou...)

6/17/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition For Determination of Potentially Dangerou...)

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Entry of Order/Judgment on the City's Petition for Determination of Potentially Dangerous Dogs and Imposition of Fines

6/25/2021: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Entry of Order/Judgment on the City's Petition for Determination of Potentially Dangerous Dogs and Imposition of Fines

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Order/Judgment on the City's Petition for Determination of Potentially Dangerous Dogs and Imposition of Fines; Filed by: Inland Valley Humane Society on behalf of City of Pomona (Petitioner); As to: Presly Tate Troha (Respondent); Kim Stockwell (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Petition For Determination of Potentially Dangerou...)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Petition For Determination of Potentially Dangerou...) of 06/17/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketHearing on Petition For Determination of Potentially Dangerous Dog and Imposition of Fines; Memorandum of Points and Authorities scheduled for 06/17/2021 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 updated: Result Date to 06/17/2021; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Inland Valley Humane Society on behalf of City of Pomona (Petitioner); As to: Presly Tate Troha (Respondent); Kim Stockwell (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Petition; Signed and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Hearing on Petition For Determination of Potentially Dangerous Dog and Imposition of Fines; Memorandum of Points and Authorities scheduled for 09/13/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 06/17/2021 10:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketDeclaration of Animal Control Officer Tayren; Filed by: Inland Valley Humane Society on behalf of City of Pomona (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Katherine Chilton in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketHearing on Petition For Determination of Potentially Dangerous Dog and Imposition of Fines; Memorandum of Points and Authorities scheduled for 09/13/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Inland Valley Humane Society on behalf of City of Pomona (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketDeclaration of Susana Espinoza Perez; Filed by: Inland Valley Humane Society on behalf of City of Pomona (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketDeclaration of Veronica Espinoza Perez; Filed by: Inland Valley Humane Society on behalf of City of Pomona (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketSummons on Petition; Issued and Filed by: Inland Valley Humane Society on behalf of City of Pomona (Petitioner); As to: Presly Tate Troha (Respondent); Kim Stockwell (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketPetition For Determination of Potentially Dangerous Dog and Imposition of Fines; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Filed by: Inland Valley Humane Society on behalf of City of Pomona (Petitioner); As to: Presly Tate Troha (Respondent); Kim Stockwell (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Petition; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SONIA R. CARVALHO

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HASSELL MICHELINA J.