This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/28/2021 at 22:03:32 (UTC).

INFINITY INSURANCE COMPANY VS PAUL REYNOSO SEGURA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/12/2021 INFINITY INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against PAUL REYNOSO SEGURA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KATHERINE CHILTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5946

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KATHERINE CHILTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INFINITY INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

SEGURA PAUL REYNOSO AKA SAUL S. REYNOSO AKA SAUL REYNOSO-SEGURA

SEGURA LORENA REYNOSO AKA LORENA REYNOSO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREEN SUSAN HOPE

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

8/12/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

8/12/2021: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

8/12/2021: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Complaint - Complaint

8/12/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

8/12/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/12/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

8/12/2021: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/15/2024
  • Hearing08/15/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • Hearing02/09/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Katherine Chilton in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/09/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 08/15/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Infinity Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Paul Reynoso Segura (Defendant); Lorena Reynoso Segura (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Infinity Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Paul Reynoso Segura (Defendant); Lorena Reynoso Segura (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Infinity Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Paul Reynoso Segura (Defendant); Lorena Reynoso Segura (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INFINITY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GREEN SUSAN HOPE