This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/25/2021 at 23:54:12 (UTC).

INFINITY INSURANCE COMPANY VS OSCAR FLORES

Case Summary

On 05/13/2021 INFINITY INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against OSCAR FLORES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KATHERINE CHILTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3715

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KATHERINE CHILTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INFINITY INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

FLORES OSCAR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREEN SUSAN HOPE

 

Court Documents

Complaint - Complaint

5/13/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/13/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

5/13/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

5/13/2021: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

5/13/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2024
  • Hearing05/16/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • Hearing11/10/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Infinity Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Oscar Flores (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Infinity Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Oscar Flores (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Infinity Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Oscar Flores (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/10/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/16/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Katherine Chilton in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INFINITY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GREEN SUSAN HOPE