This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/11/2023 at 02:15:09 (UTC).

INFINITI OF VAN NUYS VS MICHELLE COOPER

Case Summary

On 12/09/2022 INFINITI OF VAN NUYS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MICHELLE COOPER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD F. WALMARK. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2597

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RICHARD F. WALMARK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INFINITI OF VAN NUYS

Defendant

COOPER MICHELLE

 

Court Documents

Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

12/9/2022: Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

12/9/2022: Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

12/9/2022: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

1/24/2023: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

1/24/2023: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial); Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

1/27/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial); Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

1/27/2023: Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

1/30/2023: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

3/8/2023: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 03/08/2023

3/8/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 03/08/2023

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 03/08/2023; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Infiniti Of Van Nuys on 12/09/2022, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/08/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/08/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Infiniti Of Van Nuys (Plaintiff); As to: Michelle Cooper (Defendant); Service Cost: 60.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 01/29/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial); Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service); Signed and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketPursuant to the request of plaintiff, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/24/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion was rescheduled to 03/08/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/08/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service); Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Infiniti Of Van Nuys (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Infiniti Of Van Nuys (Plaintiff); As to: Michelle Cooper (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Richard F. Walmark in Department P Van Nuys Courthouse East

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/24/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less